WA SB5155 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-24 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning suspension and expulsion of kindergarten and early elementary school students.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning suspension and expulsion of kindergarten and early elementary school students.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-24SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-03-17SenateSenate Rules "X" file.
2017-02-21SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2017-02-16SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2017-02-14SenateEDU - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2017-02-14SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM.
2017-01-23SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM.
2017-01-13SenateFirst reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback