WA HB2117 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-30 - Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 8:00 AM.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Preventing breed-based dog regulations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Preventing breed-based dog regulations.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-01-30HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 8:00 AM.
2014-01-16HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 8:00 AM.
2014-01-13HouseFirst reading, referred to Judiciary
2014-12-10HousePrefiled for introduction.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback