WA HB1735 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Adding net ecological gain as a voluntary element of comprehensive plans under the growth management act.
Title
Adding net ecological gain as a voluntary element of comprehensive plans under the growth management act.
Sponsors
Rep. Debra Lekanoff [D] | Rep. Joe Fitzgibbon [D] | Rep. Alex Ramel [D] | Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] |
Rep. Nicole Macri [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-13 - House - House Committee on Environment & Energy: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-08 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2023-02-13 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2023-02-13 | House | ENVI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2023-02-13 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 1:30 PM. |
2023-02-07 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 4:00 PM. |
2023-02-02 | House | First reading, referred to Environment & Energy. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
36 | 70a | New Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 70a | 030 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 70a | 080 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 88 | 090 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
77 | 04 | New Code | See Bill Text |