WA HB1630 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-23 - Effective date 6/9/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-23 - Effective date 6/9/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing restrictions on the possession of weapons in certain locations.
Title
Establishing restrictions on the possession of weapons in certain locations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-07 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 57 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 28 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate Committee on Law & Justice: do pass (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-21 - House - House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 11 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 28 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate Committee on Law & Justice: do pass (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-21 - House - House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 11 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-23 | House | Effective date 6/9/2022. |
2022-03-23 | House | Chapter 106, 2022 Laws. |
2022-03-23 | House | Governor signed. |
2022-03-10 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | President signed. |
2022-03-08 | House | Speaker signed. |
2022-03-07 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 57; nays, 41; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2022-03-07 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 28; nays, 20; absent, 1; excused, 0. |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2022-02-24 | Senate | LAW - Majority; do pass. |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:30 AM. |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 9:30 AM. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
2022-02-14 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 57; nays, 41; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2022-02-14 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-02-14 | House | Floor amendment |
2022-02-14 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2022-02-01 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2022-01-25 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2022-01-21 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2022-01-21 | House | CRJ - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-01-21 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-12 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2022-01-10 | House | First reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary. |
2021-12-10 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Subjects
CITIES AND TOWNS
COUNTIES
CRIMES
FIREARMS
LOCAL GOVERNMENT
SCHOOLS AND SCHOOL DISTRICTS
SENTENCES AND SENTENCING
WEAPONS
COUNTIES
CRIMES
FIREARMS
LOCAL GOVERNMENT
SCHOOLS AND SCHOOL DISTRICTS
SENTENCES AND SENTENCING
WEAPONS
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
9 | 41 | 280 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 41 | 305 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |