WA HB1302 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-08 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-08 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the vehicle report of sale.
Title
Concerning the vehicle report of sale.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Timmons [D] | Rep. Spencer Hutchins [R] | Rep. Andrew Barkis [R] | Rep. Ed Orcutt [R] |
Rep. Alex Ramel [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-02 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-26 - House - House Committee on Transportation: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-26 - House - House Committee on Transportation: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-08 | House | House Rules "X" file. |
2024-01-08 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2023-04-23 | House | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 4:00 PM. |
2023-02-06 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
2023-02-02 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2023-02-02 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2023-02-01 | House | Placed on second reading suspension calendar. |
2023-02-01 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2023-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2023-01-26 | House | TR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2023-01-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 4:00 PM. |
2023-01-23 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 4:00 PM. |
2023-01-13 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation. |