VA SB600 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0602)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0602)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Real Estate Time-Share Act; partial termination of certain time-shares. Allows for the partial termination of a time-share project by a developer or an association and provides the procedures for any such partial termination. The bill also sets a one-year statute of limitations on any legal challenge or action for damages or equitable relief arising out of any termination of a time-share project in accordance with the provisions of the Virginia Real Estate Time-Share Act. The bill's provisions are declared to be effective retroactive in accordance with certain provisions of the Virginia Real Estate Time-Share Act.
Title
Virginia Real Estate Time-Share Act; partial termination of certain time-shares.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-05 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0602) | |
2024-04-05 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 602 (effective - see bill) | |
2024-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 11, 2024 |
2024-03-02 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-02-28 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB600ER) |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Enrolled |
2024-02-23 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-23 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-23 | House | Read third time |
2024-02-22 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-20 | House | Reported from General Laws (21-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-15 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2024-02-15 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-15 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 24102409D-E |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB600E |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Read second time |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (15-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24102409D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1241 (Similar To) 2024-04-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0546)