VA SB966 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-11 - Defeated by Senate (19-Y 21-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Flavored nicotine vapor product; prohibition; penalty. Prohibits the sale or distribution at retail of a flavored nicotine product. The bill provides that any person who violates this prohibition is guilty of a Class 4 misdemeanor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Flavored nicotine vapor product; prohibition, penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Defeated by Senate (19-Y 21-N) (Y: 19 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (8-Y 6-N 1-A) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-11SenateDefeated by Senate (19-Y 21-N)
2020-02-11SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenatePrinted as engrossed 20108033D-ES1
2020-02-11SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendment SB966ES1
2020-02-11SenateAmendment by Senator Ebbin agreed to
2020-02-11SenateReading of amendment waived
2020-02-11SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 20108033D-S1
2020-02-11SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-02-11SenateRead second time
2020-02-10SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2020-02-09SenateCommittee substitute printed 20108033D-S1
2020-02-09SenateReported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (8-Y 6-N 1-A)
2020-01-14SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2020-01-14SenatePresented and ordered printed 20102830D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
591293.10(n/a)See Bill Text
591293.11(n/a)See Bill Text
591293.12(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback