VA SB877 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0738)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Secretary of Technology; transfer of duties to the Secretaries of Administration and Commerce and Trade. Transfers operational responsibilities of the Office of the Secretary of Technology to the Secretary of Administration and responsibilities of the Office of the Secretary of Technology related to commercialization and entrepreneurial support to the Secretary of Commerce and Trade. The bill contains technical amendments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Technology, Secretary of; transfer of duties to Secretaries of Administration & Commerce and Trade.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Communications, Technology and Innovation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-06 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0738)
2020-04-06 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 738 (effective 7/1/20)
2020-03-12 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-12SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020
2020-03-08HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-07SenateSigned by President
2020-03-07SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB877ER)
2020-03-07SenateEnrolled
2020-02-20HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N)
2020-02-20HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2020-02-20HousePassed by temporarily
2020-02-20HouseRead third time
2020-02-19HouseRead second time
2020-02-17HouseReported from Communications, Technology and Innovation (22-Y 0-N)
2020-02-13HouseReferred to Committee on Communications, Technology and Innovation
2020-02-13HouseReferred from General Laws by voice vote
2020-02-13HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2020-02-13HouseRead first time
2020-02-13HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-01-28SenateRead third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-01-27SenateRead second time and engrossed
2020-01-24SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2020-01-22SenateReported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N)
2020-01-08SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2020-01-08SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102719D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1522425(n/a)See Bill Text
22200(n/a)See Bill Text
222005(n/a)See Bill Text
222006(n/a)See Bill Text
222007(n/a)See Bill Text
22203(n/a)See Bill Text
22203.1(n/a)See Bill Text
22203.2:5(n/a)See Bill Text
22204(n/a)See Bill Text
22205(n/a)See Bill Text
22205.2(n/a)See Bill Text
22206.3(n/a)See Bill Text
22213.3(n/a)See Bill Text
222220(n/a)See Bill Text
222221(n/a)See Bill Text
222221.1(n/a)See Bill Text
222233.1(n/a)See Bill Text
222240.1(n/a)See Bill Text
22225(n/a)See Bill Text
22225.1(n/a)See Bill Text
222485(n/a)See Bill Text
222698(n/a)See Bill Text
222699.1(n/a)See Bill Text
222699.4(n/a)See Bill Text
222699.5(n/a)See Bill Text
222699.7(n/a)See Bill Text
222738(n/a)See Bill Text
222817.1(n/a)See Bill Text
222822(n/a)See Bill Text
223503(n/a)See Bill Text
223504(n/a)See Bill Text
223803(n/a)See Bill Text
22436(n/a)See Bill Text
22437(n/a)See Bill Text
2312911.1(n/a)See Bill Text
2313102(n/a)See Bill Text
581322.02(n/a)See Bill Text
581402(n/a)See Bill Text
591497(n/a)See Bill Text
591550(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback