VA SB422 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-17 - Governor: Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on May 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-17 - Governor: Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Residential Landlord and Tenant Act; prohibited fees. Prohibits landlords subject to the Virginia Residential Landlord and Tenant Act from requiring a tenant to (i) pay any fee for the maintenance or repair of any unit subject to such rental agreement unless necessitated by the tenant's violation of a requirement of the Act or (ii) pay any fee to submit periodic rent payments or other amounts due, unless the landlord offers an alternative method of payment that does not include additional fees.
Title
Virginia Residential Landlord and Tenant Act; prohibited provisions, fees for maintenance.
Sponsors
Sen. Adam Ebbin [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Senate rejected Governor's recommendation (19-Y 21-N) (Y: 19 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (20-Y 20-N) (Y: 20 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-03-01 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (52-Y 44-N) (Y: 52 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (22-Y 17-N) (Y: 22 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (13-Y 1-N 1-A) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (20-Y 20-N) (Y: 20 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-03-01 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (52-Y 44-N) (Y: 52 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (22-Y 17-N) (Y: 22 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (13-Y 1-N 1-A) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-17 | Governor: Vetoed by Governor | |
2024-04-17 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., May 17, 2024 | |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Communicated to Governor |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Senate rejected Governor's recommendation (19-Y 21-N) |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Reconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Chair votes Yes |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (20-Y 20-N) |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Governor's recommendation received by Senate |
2024-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 11, 2024 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB422ER) |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Enrolled |
2024-03-01 | House | VOTE: Passage (52-Y 44-N) |
2024-03-01 | House | Passed House (52-Y 44-N) |
2024-03-01 | House | Read third time |
2024-02-29 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-27 | House | Reported from General Laws (13-Y 9-N) |
2024-02-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N) |
2024-02-19 | House | Assigned GL sub: Housing/Consumer Protection |
2024-02-15 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2024-02-15 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-15 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (22-Y 17-N) |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 24105046D-E |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB422E |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Read second time |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (13-Y 1-N 1-A) |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24105046D |
Same As/Similar To
HB993 (Similar To) 2024-05-17 - Governor: Vetoed by Governor