VA SB415 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-09 - Failed to pass in Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-09 - Failed to pass in Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Freedom of Information Act; definition of "meeting." Amends the definition of "meeting" as it relates to the Virginia Freedom of Information Act to add an exception for local political party meetings. The bill is a recommendation of the FOIA Council.
Title
Virginia Freedom of Information Act; amends definition of "meeting."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Senate: House amendment rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N) (Y: 0 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2024-02-27 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Senate: House amendment rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N) (Y: 0 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2024-02-27 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-09 | Senate | Failed to pass in Senate |
2024-03-09 | Senate | No further action taken |
2024-03-06 | House | Delegates: Bennett-Parker, McClure, Cherry |
2024-03-06 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Senators: Stuart, Locke, McPike |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2024-03-01 | House | House requested conference committee |
2024-03-01 | House | House insisted on amendment |
2024-02-29 | Senate | House amendment rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N) |
2024-02-27 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (97-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-27 | House | Passed House with amendment BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-27 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2024-02-27 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2024-02-27 | House | Read third time |
2024-02-26 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-22 | House | Reported from General Laws with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-20 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-14 | House | Assigned GL sub: Procurement/Open Government |
2024-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2024-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 1-N) |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24103187D |