VA SB1581 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0844)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Parental leave. Codifies the policy described in Executive Order Number 12 (2018) providing parental leave to state employees, consisting of eight weeks (320 hours) of paid leave in addition to leave provided under other state and federal programs. The bill requires that parental leave be available following the birth, adoption, or foster placement of a child under age 18 and be available to both parents of such child if both are state employees. The bill requires that parental leave be taken within six months of a birth, adoption, or foster placement and limits parental leave to once in any 12-month period and only once per child. This bill is identical to HB 2234.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Parental leave benefits; DHRM to implement and administer.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-03 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (83-Y 10-N) (Y: 83 N: 10 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (1-Y 39-N) (Y: 1 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-03 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0844)
2019-04-03HouseEnacted, Chapter 844 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-04-03HouseSigned by Speaker as reenrolled
2019-04-03SenateSigned by President as reenrolled
2019-04-03SenateReenrolled bill text (SB1581ER2)
2019-04-03SenateReenrolled
2019-04-03 Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted
2019-04-03HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
2019-04-03HouseHouse concurred in Governor's recommendation (98-Y 0-N)
2019-04-03SenateSenate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 0-N)
2019-03-22SenateGovernor's recommendation received by Senate
2019-03-11 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-11SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 11, 2019
2019-03-09SenateSigned by President
2019-03-07HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-03-07SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1581ER)
2019-03-07SenateEnrolled
2019-02-23HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (83-Y 10-N)
2019-02-23HouseConference report agreed to by House (83-Y 10-N)
2019-02-23SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-23 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2019-02-21HouseDelegates: Robinson, Jones, S.C., Peace, Krizek
2019-02-21HouseConferees appointed by House
2019-02-21SenateSenators: Suetterlein, Vogel, Mason
2019-02-21SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2019-02-21SenateSenate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N)
2019-02-21HouseHouse requested conference committee
2019-02-21HouseHouse insisted on substitute
2019-02-21SenateHouse substitute rejected by Senate (1-Y 39-N)
2019-02-20HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
2019-02-20HousePassed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
2019-02-20HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute SB1581H1
2019-02-20HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19107129D-H1
2019-02-20HouseRead third time
2019-02-19HouseRead second time
2019-02-18HouseCommittee substitute printed 19107129D-H1
2019-02-18HouseReported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2019-02-14HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13HouseAssigned App. sub: Compensation & Retirement
2019-02-12HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2019-02-12HouseReferred from General Laws by voice vote
2019-02-06HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2019-02-06HouseRead first time
2019-02-06HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-04SenateRead third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-01SenateRead second time and engrossed
2019-01-31SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-30SenateReported from Finance (14-Y 0-N)
2019-01-28SenateRereferred to Finance
2019-01-28SenateReported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N)
2019-01-09SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2019-01-09SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103450D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
221210(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+SB1581
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1581+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1581H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1581ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1581ER2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0844+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S12V0078+SB1581
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S05V0188+SB1581
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0268SB1581+SB1581
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0320SB1581+SB1581
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0202V0019+SB1581
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H02V0205+SB1581
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3132+SB1581
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0943SB1581+SB1581
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0998SB1581+SB1581
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV1095SB1581+SB1581
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3348+SB1581
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV1136SB1581+SB1581
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3437+SB1581

Bill Comments

feedback