VA SB1406 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0694)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0694)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Behavior analysts; assistant behavior analysts; licensure criteria; certifying entities. Provides in the criteria for licensure as a behavior analyst or assistant behavior analyst established by the Board of Medicine that certain documentation must be provided by the Behavior Analyst Certification Board or its successor. Under current law, such documentation must be provided by the Behavior Analyst Certification Board or any other entity that is nationally accredited to certify practitioners of behavior analysis.
Title
Behavior analysts or assistant behavior analysts; licensure criteria, certifying entities.
Sponsors
Sen. Jill Vogel [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-27 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0694) | |
2023-03-27 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 694 (effective 7/1/23) | |
2023-03-02 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023 | |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 2, 2023 |
2023-02-24 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1406ER) |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Enrolled |
2023-02-21 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-21 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-21 | House | Read third time |
2023-02-20 | House | Read second time |
2023-02-16 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2023-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health Professions |
2023-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2023-01-11 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23102329D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1946 (Same As) 2023-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0693)
HB1946 (Same As) 2023-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0693)
HB1946 (Same As) 2023-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0693)