VA SB1150 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Requires 2/3 affirmative votes to pass in enrolled form
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Issuance of warrants by magistrates. Provides that a magistrate may not issue an arrest warrant for a misdemeanor offense where the accused is a law-enforcement officer and the alleged offense arises out of the performance of his public duties upon the basis of a complaint by a person other than a law-enforcement officer or an animal control officer without prior authorization by the attorney for the Commonwealth or by a law-enforcement agency. The bill provides for the appointment of an attorney for the Commonwealth from outside the jurisdiction if a conflict of interest exists for the attorney for the Commonwealth having jurisdiction.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Warrants; issuance by magistrates.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate: Motion to pass in enrolled form rejected (22-Y 18-N) (Y: 20 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (91-Y 8-N) (Y: 91 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (23-Y 17-N) (Y: 23 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (9-Y 5-N) (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-03SenateRequires 2/3 affirmative votes to pass in enrolled form
2019-04-03SenateMotion to pass in enrolled form rejected (22-Y 18-N)
2019-03-26 Governor: Vetoed by Governor
2019-03-04 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-04SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019
2019-02-23HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-23SenateSigned by President
2019-02-23SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1150ER)
2019-02-23SenateEnrolled
2019-02-20HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (91-Y 8-N)
2019-02-20HousePassed House (91-Y 8-N)
2019-02-20HouseRead third time
2019-02-19HouseRead second time
2019-02-15HouseReported from Courts of Justice (17-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N)
2019-02-12HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
2019-01-21HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-21HouseRead first time
2019-01-21HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-01-17SenateRead third time and passed Senate (23-Y 17-N)
2019-01-16SenateRead second time and engrossed
2019-01-15SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-14SenateReported from Courts of Justice (9-Y 5-N)
2019-01-02SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-02SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100889D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
19271(n/a)See Bill Text
19272(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback