VA HB911 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-30 - Incorporated by General Laws
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Virginia Lottery; repeal prohibition against sale of lottery tickets over the Internet; electronic sports betting; Problem Gambling Treatment and Support Fund; Sports Betting Operations Fund; penalties. Directs the Virginia Lottery (the Lottery) to regulate electronic sports betting. Under the provisions of the bill, betting on amateur sports, including youth sports and college sports, is prohibited, and betting on professional sports is allowed. The bill provides protections for vulnerable populations and protections of a sports bettor's rights to self-exclusion, data privacy and security, recourse, and integrity and transparency of gameplay. The bill prohibits betting by Lottery employees, participants in athletic events on which the bet is placed, and persons under age 21. The penalty for engaging in prohibited betting is a Class 1 misdemeanor. The bill directs the Lottery to establish a voluntary exclusion program, which would allow individuals to request that the Lottery exclude them from buying lottery tickets or participating in electronic sports betting.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Virginia Lottery; repeals prohibition against sale of lottery tickets over Internet.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-30HouseIncorporated by General Laws
2020-01-28HouseSubcommittee recommends incorporating (HB896-Sickles) by voice vote
2020-01-17HouseAssigned GL sub: ABC/Gaming
2020-01-07HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2020-01-07HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102127D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
182334.3(n/a)See Bill Text
192389(n/a)See Bill Text
223711(n/a)See Bill Text
372304(n/a)See Bill Text
372314.1(n/a)See Bill Text
5814002(n/a)See Bill Text
5814007(n/a)See Bill Text
5814007.2(n/a)See Bill Text
5814008(n/a)See Bill Text
5814015.1(n/a)See Bill Text
5814100(n/a)See Bill Text
5814132(n/a)See Bill Text
591364(n/a)See Bill Text
591569(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback