VA HB509 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0243)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Security freezes on credit reports; fees. Prohibits a credit reporting agency from requiring a consumer to pay a fee to place a security freeze on the consumer's credit report. Currently, a consumer may be required to pay a fee of no more than $5 to place a security freeze on his credit report. Victims of identity theft are currently exempt from the fee.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Security freezes; fees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House: VOTE: (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-16 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-10 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0243)
2020-03-10 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 243 (effective 7/1/20)
2020-03-03 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 10, 2020
2020-03-03HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 3, 2020
2020-02-26SenateSigned by President
2020-02-25HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-02-25HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB509ER)
2020-02-25HouseEnrolled
2020-02-20SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-20SenateRead third time
2020-02-19SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2020-02-17SenateReported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
2020-01-23SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2020-01-23SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-01-22HouseVOTE: (100-Y 0-N)
2020-01-22HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
2020-01-21HouseRead second time and engrossed
2020-01-20HouseRead first time
2020-01-16HouseReported from Labor and Commerce (22-Y 0-N)
2020-01-04HouseReferred to Committee on Labor and Commerce
2020-01-04HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100947D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
591444.2(n/a)See Bill Text
591444.3(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback