VA HB332 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0282)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0282)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Termination of trust; notice requirements. Provides that a trustee seeking to terminate a trust consisting of trust property that has a total value of less than $100,000 may do so without a court order, provided that the trustee sends notice, as specified in the bill, to any qualified beneficiaries or cotrustees.
Title
Termination of trust; notice requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-19 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-19 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-02 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0282) | |
2024-04-02 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 282 (effective 7/1/24) | |
2024-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2024 |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-02-27 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-02-27 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB332ER) |
2024-02-27 | House | Enrolled |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Read third time |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (11-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2024-01-25 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-25 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-24 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB332H1 |
2024-01-24 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 24105569D-H1 |
2024-01-24 | House | Read second time |
2024-01-23 | House | Read first time |
2024-01-19 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-19 | House | Committee substitute printed 24105569D-H1 |
2024-01-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-16 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Civil |
2024-01-05 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2024-01-05 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24102292D |
Same As/Similar To
SB63 (Similar To) 2024-04-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0336)