VA HB291 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0024)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0024)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Long-term services and supports screening; expedited screening; screening exemption; emergency. Modifies existing provisions regarding the required long-term services and supports screening under the state plan for medical assistance services by creating greater flexibility for how screenings are completed under certain circumstances. Under the bill, any individual receiving inpatient services in an acute care hospital discharged to a nursing facility for skilled care only is not required to be screened prior to discharge from the hospital unless the individual requests the screening. The bill directs the Department of Medical Assistance Services to adopt emergency regulations to implement the provisions of the bill.
Title
Long-term services and supports screening; expedited screening and screening exemption.
Sponsors
Del. Mike Cherry [R] | Del. Mark Earley [R] | Del. David Owen [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: Passage Emergency (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - House - House: Reported from Health and Human Services (18-Y 4-N) (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: Passage Emergency (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - House - House: Reported from Health and Human Services (18-Y 4-N) (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0024) | |
2024-03-08 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 24 (effective 3/8/24) | |
2024-03-01 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-01 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 1, 2024 |
2024-02-24 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-02-21 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-02-21 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB291ER) |
2024-02-21 | House | Enrolled |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Read third time |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (13-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2024-01-25 | House | VOTE: Passage Emergency (98-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-25 | House | Read third time and passed House (98-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-24 | House | Printed as engrossed 24100614D-E |
2024-01-24 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB291E |
2024-01-24 | House | Amendment by Delegate Cherry agreed to |
2024-01-24 | House | Read second time |
2024-01-23 | House | Passed by for the day |
2024-01-22 | House | Read first time |
2024-01-18 | House | Reported from Health and Human Services (18-Y 4-N) |
2024-01-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services |
2024-01-05 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed with emergency clause; offered 01/10/24 24100614D |
Same As/Similar To
SB24 (Similar To) 2024-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0152)