VA HB2114 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0154)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0154)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Special license plates; members of the International Association of Fire Fighters. Changes the special license plates for members of the International Association of Fire Fighters from nonrevenue sharing to revenue sharing and provides for the moneys to support the efforts of various charitable organizations supported by the firefighters throughout the Commonwealth. This bill is identical to SB 1474.
Title
License plates, special; members of the International Association of Fire Fighters.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-27 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0154) | |
2019-02-27 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 154 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-18 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-02-18 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 18, 2019 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-14 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-14 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2114ER) |
2019-02-14 | House | Enrolled |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Reported from Transportation (13-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-01-30 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-30 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-30 | House | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House |
2019-01-30 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-30 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-29 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2019-01-28 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-24 | House | Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-14 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2019-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101727D |