VA HB143 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0271)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0271)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Utility work database. Requires the Department of Transportation to establish and maintain a publicly accessible database and map of all utility work that has been approved by the Department and will occur within a highway right-of-way in a residential neighborhood. The bill has a delayed effective date of January 1, 2025. Utility work database. Requires the Department of Transportation to establish and maintain a publicly accessible database and map of all utility work that has been approved by the Department and will occur within a highway right-of-way in a residential neighborhood. The bill has a delayed effective date of January 1, 2025.
Title
Utility work database; VDOT to establish and maintain a publicly accessible database.
Sponsors
Del. David Reid [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-02 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0271) | |
2024-04-02 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 271 (effective 1/1/25) | |
2024-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2024 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-03-04 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-03-04 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB143ER) |
2024-03-04 | House | Enrolled |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Read third time |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2024-02-13 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-13 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-12 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB143H1 |
2024-02-12 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 24106591D-H1 |
2024-02-12 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-11 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-08 | House | Committee substitute printed 24106591D-H1 |
2024-02-08 | House | Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-06 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-16 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Transportation Infrastructure and Funding |
2024-01-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2024-01-02 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24100840D |