US SB990 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on April 2 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-10-24 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 268.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Platte River Recovery Implementation Program Extension Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Platte River Recovery Implementation Program Extension Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-24SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 268.
2019-10-24SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski without amendment. With written report No. 116-146.
2019-09-25SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
2019-06-26SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water and Power. Hearings held.
2019-04-02SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.

Same As/Similar To

HB3237 (Same As) 2019-07-25 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback