US SB625 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
Pending: Senate Rules And Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
Pending: Senate Rules And Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Election Assistance Commission to carry out a pilot program providing funds, during FY2019, to local educational agencies (LEAs) for initiatives that provide 12th graders with voter registration information. LEAs must consult with their state and local election officials in developing the initiatives.
Title
Students VOTE Act Students Voicing Opinions in Today's Elections Act
Sponsors
Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] | Sen. Angus King [I-ME] |
Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] | Sen. Tina Smith [D-MN] | Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] | Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-28 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration. |
Same As/Similar To
HB126 (Related) 2019-01-03 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
HB1 (Related) 2019-03-14 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 39.
SB949 (Related) 2019-03-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB1 (Related) 2019-03-14 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 39.
SB949 (Related) 2019-03-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Education
Education programs funding
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Elementary and secondary education
Education programs funding
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Elementary and secondary education
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/625/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s625/BILLS-116s625is.pdf |