US SB466 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 22 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 469.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A bill to clarify the description of certain Federal land under the Northern Arizona Land Exchange and Verde River Basin Partnership Act of 2005 to include additional land in the Kaibab National Forest. (Sec. 1) This bill amends the Northern Arizona Land Exchange and Verde River Basin Partnership Act of 2005 to convey to the Yavapai Ranch 25 acres of land within the Kaibab National Forest at the Gila and Salt River Meridian, Coconino County, Arizona.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill to clarify the description of certain Federal land under the Northern Arizona Land Exchange and Verde River Basin Partnership Act of 2005 to include additional land in the Kaibab National Forest.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-22HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 469.
2018-03-22HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-615.
2018-03-14HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
2018-03-14HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2018-03-14HouseSubcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged.
2018-01-02HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
2017-12-22HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
2017-12-22HouseReceived in the House.
2017-12-22SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2017-12-21SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S8267-8269; text: CR S8269)
2017-05-03SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 55.
2017-05-03SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski without amendment. With written report No. 115-41.
2017-03-30SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
2017-02-28SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback