US SB1219 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-04 - By Senator Murkowski from Committee on Energy and Natural Resources filed written report. Report No. 115-403.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-04 - By Senator Murkowski from Committee on Energy and Natural Resources filed written report. Report No. 115-403.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Lake Bistineau Land Title Stability Act This bill declares that the document titled "Dependent Re-Survey, Extension Survey and Survey of Two Islands, Sections 17, 29, and 30" (published in the Federal Register on February 27, 1969) shall not be considered to be, or serve as, a gross error determination and shall have no legal force or effect on the ownership of certain land surrounding Lake Bistineau in northern Louisiana. The meander lines recorded in the original survey of such land approved by the Surveyor General on December 8, 1842, shall be definitive for purposes of determining title to such land and two adjacent islands. The Department of the Interior shall prepare a disclaimer of any U.S. right, title, or interest in and to any such land that is located outside such meander lines and any omitted land that was in place, but not included, in the original survey.
Title
Lake Bistineau Land Title Stability Act
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Cassidy [R-LA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-04 | Senate | By Senator Murkowski from Committee on Energy and Natural Resources filed written report. Report No. 115-403. |
2018-11-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 690. |
2018-11-29 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report. |
2018-10-02 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held. |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3392 (Same As) 2018-06-26 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.