US HR458 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-9)
Status: Introduced on June 24 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-04 - Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Reaffirming the strong partnership between Tunisia and the United States and supporting the people of Tunisia in their continued pursuit of democratic reforms. This resolution commends the people of Tunisia for their commitment to democracy, the rule of law, and free elections, and encourages Tunisia's political leaders to work together to accelerate economic reforms and anti-corruption measures. It also calls on the government to fully implement the Tunisian Constitution of 2014, which includes protections for civil liberties and the establishment of the Constitutional Court.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Reaffirming the strong partnership between Tunisia and the United States and supporting the people of Tunisia in their continued pursuit of democratic reforms.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-04HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
2020-03-04HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-07-17HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Middle East, North Africa and International Terrorism.
2019-06-24HouseReferred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
2019-06-24HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SR236 (Related) 2019-10-29 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S6256; text: 6/5/2019 CR S3264)

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback