US HB6303 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Introduced on March 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-19 - Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
Pending: House Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-19 - Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
Pending: House Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Small Business Administration (SBA) to temporarily waive, or reduce to the maximum extent possible, certain fees on SBA loans. The bill also temporarily increases the guarantee amount and loan size for certain SBA loans, including express loans, and it permanently waives the guarantee fee on SBA loans for veterans.
Title
Increasing Access to Capital Act of 2020
Sponsors
Rep. Jason Crow [D-CO] | Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY] | Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN] | Rep. Diana DeGette [D-CO] |
Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA] | Rep. Ed Perlmutter [D-CO] |
Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL] | Rep. Harley Rouda [D-CA] | Rep. Luis Correa [D-CA] | Rep. Dwight Evans [D-PA] |
Rep. Jerry McNerney [D-CA] | Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA] | Rep. Al Lawson [D-FL] | Rep. Conor Lamb [D-PA] |
Rep. Elizabeth Fletcher [D-TX] | Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-19 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Small Business. |
2020-03-19 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB6379 (Related) 2020-03-23 - Referred to the Committee on Appropriations, and in addition to the Committees on the Budget, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB6312 (Related) 2020-03-19 - Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
SB3554 (Related) 2020-03-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.
HB6800 (Related) 2020-07-23 - Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.
HR967 (Similar To) 2020-05-15 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB6312 (Related) 2020-03-19 - Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
SB3554 (Related) 2020-03-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.
HB6800 (Related) 2020-07-23 - Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.
HR967 (Similar To) 2020-05-15 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Commerce
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Government lending and loan guarantees
Industrial facilities
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Manufacturing
Small business
User charges and fees
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Veterans' loans, housing, homeless programs
Commerce
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Government lending and loan guarantees
Industrial facilities
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Manufacturing
Small business
User charges and fees
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Veterans' loans, housing, homeless programs
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/6303/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr6303/BILLS-116hr6303ih.pdf |