US HB5998 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-6)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
Pending: House Conservation and Forestry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
Pending: House Conservation and Forestry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Department of the Interior and the Department of Agriculture to make the National Parks and Federal Recreational Lands Pass available at no cost to members of Gold Star Families.
Title
Gold Star Families Parks Pass Act
Sponsors
Rep. Jared Golden [D-ME] | Rep. Robert Wittman [R-VA] | Rep. Chrissy Houlahan [D-PA] | Rep. Conor Lamb [D-PA] |
Rep. Mike Levin [D-CA] | Rep. David Trone [D-MD] | Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA] | Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA] |
Rep. Elissa Slotkin [D-MI] | Rep. Max Rose [D-NY] | Rep. Salud Carbajal [D-CA] | Rep. Josh Harder [D-CA] |
Rep. Don Bacon [R-NE] | Rep. Michael Turner [R-OH] | Rep. Nicholas Taylor [R-TX] | Rep. Jackie Speier [D-CA] |
Rep. James Langevin [D-RI] | Rep. Joe Cunningham [D-SC] | Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA] | Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD] |
Rep. Greg Steube [R-FL] | Rep. Brian Mast [R-FL] | Rep. Jason Crow [D-CO] | Rep. Gil Cisneros [D-CA] |
Rep. Dean Phillips [D-MN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry. |
2020-03-05 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands. |
2020-02-27 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-02-27 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-02-27 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3366 (Related) 2020-09-16 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held.
Subjects
Military personnel and dependents
Outdoor recreation
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
User charges and fees
Outdoor recreation
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
User charges and fees
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/5998/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr5998/BILLS-116hr5998ih.pdf |