US HB5845 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 71-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Break Free From Plastic Pollution Act of 2020 This bill sets forth requirements related to waste and recycling collection systems for a variety of products and materials, including plastics. The bill makes certain producers of products (e.g., packaging, paper, single-use products, beverage containers, or food service products) fiscally responsible for collecting, managing, and recycling or composting the products after consumer use. In addition, the bill establishes (1) minimum percentages of products that must be reused, recycled, or composted; and (2) an increasing percentage of recycled content that must be contained in beverage containers. Beginning on January 1, 2022, the bill phases out a variety of single-use products, such as plastic utensils. The bill also sets forth provisions to encourage the reduction of single-use products, including by establishing programs to refund consumers for returning beverage containers and by establishing a tax on carryout bags. The bill creates a temporary moratorium on new or expanded permits for facilities that manufacture plastics until regulations are updated to address pollution from the facilities. The Environmental Protection Agency must publish guidelines for a national standardized labeling system for recycling and composting receptacles. Producers must include labels on their products that are easy to read and indicate whether the products are recyclable, compostable, or reusable. Finally, the bill establishes limitations on the export of plastic waste to other countries.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Break Free From Plastic Pollution Act of 2020

Sponsors

Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA]Rep. Katherine Clark [D-MA]Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN]Rep. Mike Quigley [D-IL]
Rep. Nanette Barragan [D-CA]Rep. Ed Case [D-HI]Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA]Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY]
Rep. Debra Haaland [D-NM]Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL]Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA]Rep. Pramila Jayapal [D-WA]
Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA]Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA]Rep. Mike Levin [D-CA]Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA]
Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN]Rep. Seth Moulton [D-MA]Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC]Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA]
Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME]Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD]Rep. Harley Rouda [D-CA]Rep. John Sarbanes [D-MD]
Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL]Rep. Thomas Suozzi [D-NY]Rep. Rashida Tlaib [D-MI]Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY]
Rep. Maxine Waters [D-CA]Rep. Peter Welch [D-VT]Rep. Salud Carbajal [D-CA]Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA]
Rep. Veronica Escobar [D-TX]Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY]Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ]Rep. Ayanna Pressley [D-MA]
Rep. Kim Schrier [D-WA]Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY]Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY]Rep. Lloyd Doggett [D-TX]
Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA]Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR]Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO]Rep. Bennie Thompson [D-MS]
Rep. Joyce Beatty [D-OH]Rep. Stephen Lynch [D-MA]Rep. Frederica Wilson [D-FL]Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ]
Rep. Katie Porter [D-CA]Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA]Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D-CA]Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR]
Rep. David Trone [D-MD]Rep. Rick Larsen [D-WA]Rep. Andy Levin [D-MI]Rep. Susan Davis [D-CA]
Rep. Ilhan Omar [D-MN]Rep. Lisa Rochester [D-DE]Rep. Antonio Delgado [D-NY]Rep. Suzan DelBene [D-WA]
Rep. Daniel Kildee [D-MI]Rep. Joseph Kennedy [D-MA]Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR]Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA]
Rep. Madeleine Dean [D-PA]Rep. Jesus Garcia [D-IL]Rep. Emanuel Cleaver [D-MO]Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA]
Rep. Juan Vargas [D-CA]Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA]Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-12HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
2020-02-11HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2020-02-11HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2020-02-11HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2020-02-11HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2020-02-11HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB3263 (Same As) 2020-02-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB3944 (Related) 2020-06-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.

Subjects

Accounting and auditing
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Advanced technology and technological innovations
Advisory bodies
Air quality
Alcoholic beverages
Alternative and renewable resources
Aquatic ecology
Business records
Child health
Civil actions and liability
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Congressional oversight
Consumer affairs
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Ecology
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental health
Environmental protection
Environmental Protection Agency (EPA)
Environmental regulatory procedures
Food industry and services
Food supply, safety, and labeling
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Government trust funds
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Indian lands and resources rights
Industrial facilities
Inflation and prices
Intergovernmental relations
International organizations and cooperation
Licensing and registrations
Manufacturing
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Marine pollution
Marketing and advertising
Materials
Navigation, waterways, harbors
Oil and gas
Performance measurement
Pollution liability
Public-private cooperation
Racial and ethnic relations
Retail and wholesale trades
Sales and excise taxes
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Solid waste and recycling
State and local government operations
State and local taxation
Tax-exempt organizations
Trade restrictions
User charges and fees
Water quality
Water use and supply
Worker safety and health

US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback