US HB5385 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 27 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-09-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

To make housing affordable, and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Affordable HOME Act Affordable Housing Opportunities Made Equitable Act

Sponsors

Rep. Ilhan Omar [D-MN]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-28HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
2021-09-27HouseReferred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, the Judiciary, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2021-09-27HouseReferred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, the Judiciary, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2021-09-27HouseReferred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, the Judiciary, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2021-09-27HouseReferred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, the Judiciary, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2021-09-27HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB3200 (Related) 2021-05-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
SB1632 (Related) 2021-05-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
SB2234 (Same As) 2021-06-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback