US HB4300 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Engrossed on November 19 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-11-19 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Fostering Stable Housing Opportunities Act of 2019

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fostering Stable Housing Opportunities Act of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-19SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
2019-11-18HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2019-11-18HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8937-8938)
2019-11-18HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4300.
2019-11-18HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8937-8939)
2019-11-18HouseMr. Green, Al (TX) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2019-09-20HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 47 - 0.
2019-09-20HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-09-19HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-09-18HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-09-12HouseReferred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
2019-09-12HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB2803 (Related) 2019-11-07 - Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 116-125.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback