US HB3976 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-10 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 12711 East Jefferson Avenue in Detroit, Michigan, as the "Aretha Franklin Post Office Building". Designates the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 12711 East Jefferson Avenue in Detroit, Michigan, as the "Aretha Franklin Post Office Building."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 12711 East Jefferson Avenue in Detroit, Michigan, as the "Aretha Franklin Post Office Building".

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-10SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
2020-02-05HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2020-02-05HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H827)
2020-02-05HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3976.
2020-02-05HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H827-828)
2020-02-05HouseMrs. Maloney, Carolyn B. moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
2019-12-19HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-07-25HouseReferred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
2019-07-25HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback