US HB3851 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 88-54-1)
Status: Introduced on July 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-13 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 299.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Brand USA Extension Act This bill (1) extends funding for Brand USA, the Corporation for Travel Promotion, through FY2027; (2) raises the fee for using the electronic system for travel authorization; and (3) otherwise modifies the duties and powers of Brand USA.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Brand USA Extension Act

Sponsors

Rep. Peter Welch [D-VT]Rep. Gus Bilirakis [R-FL]Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV]Rep. Billy Long [R-MO]
Rep. Greg Walden [R-OR]Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA]Rep. Gregorio Sablan [I-MP]Rep. Greg Stanton [D-AZ]
Rep. Brian Higgins [D-NY]Rep. Jeff Van Drew [D-NJ]Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR]Rep. Guy Reschenthaler [R-PA]
Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA]Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA]Rep. Henry Cuellar [D-TX]Rep. Jennifer Wexton [D-VA]
Rep. Kathy Castor [D-FL]Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL]Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL]Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA]
Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC]Rep. Luis Correa [D-CA]Rep. Neal Dunn [R-FL]Rep. Ed Case [D-HI]
Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME]Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR]Rep. Bruce Westerman [R-AR]Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH]
Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA]Rep. Kendra Horn [D-OK]Rep. Linda Sanchez [D-CA]Rep. Scott Tipton [R-CO]
Rep. Angela Craig [D-MN]Rep. John Katko [R-NY]Rep. Don Young [R-AK]Rep. David Roe [R-TN]
Rep. Joe Wilson [R-SC]Rep. Rebecca Sherrill [D-NJ]Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY]Rep. Donna Shalala [D-FL]
Rep. Norma Torres [D-CA]Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ]Rep. Greg Gianforte [R-MT]Rep. Joe Cunningham [D-SC]
Rep. Suzanne Lee [D-NV]Rep. Daniel Kildee [D-MI]Rep. Susan Brooks [R-IN]Rep. Darin LaHood [R-IL]
Rep. Mark Amodei [R-NV]Rep. Adam Kinzinger [R-IL]Rep. Frank Lucas [R-OK]Rep. Denver Riggleman [R-VA]
Rep. Mike Levin [D-CA]Rep. Charles Fleischmann [R-TN]Rep. Kurt Schrader [D-OR]Rep. Raul Ruiz [D-CA]
Rep. Xochitl Torres Small [D-NM]Rep. Christopher Pappas [D-NH]Rep. Christopher Smith [R-NJ]Rep. Fred Upton [R-MI]
Rep. John Rutherford [R-FL]Rep. David Trone [D-MD]Rep. Ron Wright [R-TX]Rep. Charlie Crist [D-FL]
Rep. Marc Veasey [D-TX]Rep. Don Bacon [R-NE]Rep. Mike Quigley [D-IL]Rep. Ed Perlmutter [D-CO]
Rep. Bill Huizenga [R-MI]Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY]Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA]Rep. Mike Kelly [R-PA]
Rep. William Keating [D-MA]Rep. Ralph Norman [R-SC]Rep. Josh Gottheimer [D-NJ]Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA]
Rep. Haley Stevens [D-MI]Rep. Stephanie Murphy [D-FL]Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI]Rep. Bill Johnson [R-OH]
Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA]Rep. Harley Rouda [D-CA]Rep. Bill Foster [D-IL]Rep. Lance Gooden [R-TX]
Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY]Rep. Ross Spano [R-FL]Rep. Blaine Luetkemeyer [R-MO]Rep. Mario Diaz-Balart [R-FL]
Rep. Earl Carter [R-GA]Rep. David Joyce [R-OH]Rep. Steven Horsford [D-NV]Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI]
Rep. Jason Smith [R-MO]Rep. Elaine Luria [D-VA]Rep. Jeff Fortenberry [R-NE]Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI]
Rep. Don Beyer [D-VA]Rep. Larry Bucshon [R-IN]Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA]Rep. Doris Matsui [D-CA]
Rep. Terri Sewell [D-AL]Rep. Ben Lujan [D-NM]Rep. Tom Rice [R-SC]Rep. Will Hurd [R-TX]
Rep. Bill Pascrell [D-NJ]Rep. Donald McEachin [D-VA]Rep. Ann Wagner [R-MO]Rep. William Timmons [R-SC]
Rep. Tom O'Halleran [D-AZ]Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA]Rep. Diana DeGette [D-CO]Rep. Gil Cisneros [D-CA]
Rep. G. Butterfield [D-NC]Rep. Elizabeth Fletcher [D-TX]Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL]Rep. Cindy Axne [D-IA]
Rep. Lori Trahan [D-MA]Rep. Michael Turner [R-OH]Rep. Robert Latta [R-OH]Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL]
Rep. Jim Cooper [D-TN]Rep. Francis Rooney [R-FL]Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK]Rep. Steve Stivers [R-OH]
Rep. Brett Guthrie [R-KY]Rep. Rob Bishop [R-UT]Rep. Vicente Gonzalez [D-TX]Rep. Dusty Johnson [R-SD]
Rep. Sharice Davids [D-KS]Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA]Rep. Robert Aderholt [R-AL]Rep. Lisa Rochester [D-DE]
Rep. Andy Kim [D-NJ]Rep. Chrissy Houlahan [D-PA]Rep. Dan Crenshaw [R-TX]Rep. Conor Lamb [D-PA]
Rep. Joaquin Castro [D-TX]Rep. Susan Wild [D-PA]Rep. Alexander Mooney [R-WV]Rep. Madeleine Dean [D-PA]
Rep. Salud Carbajal [D-CA]Rep. Elissa Slotkin [D-MI]Rep. Colin Allred [D-TX]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-13HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 299.
2020-01-13HouseCommittee on Homeland Security discharged.
2020-01-13HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 116-376, Part I.
2019-11-20HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
2019-11-20HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-11-14HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote .
2019-10-24HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
2019-08-06HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Border Security, Facilitation, and Operations.
2019-07-22HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Consumer Protection and Commerce.
2019-07-18HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Homeland Security, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-07-18HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Homeland Security, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-07-18HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB2203 (Related) 2019-07-24 - Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported with amendments favorably.
HB1865 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-94. (TXT | PDF)

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback