US HB2820 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 17 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 73.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Dream Act of 2019

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Dream Act of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-30HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 73.
2019-05-30HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 116-98.
2019-05-22HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 19 - 10.
2019-05-22HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-05-17HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
2019-05-17HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB2821 (Related) 2019-05-30 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 72.
HB6 (Related) 2019-06-10 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 112.
SB874 (Related) 2019-03-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HR415 (Similar To) 2019-06-04 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback