US HB2507 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-16)
Status: Engrossed on July 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-25 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-25 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Reauthorizes through FY2024 and revises several programs and activities relating to newborn screening for genetic diseases. Among other things, the bill reauthorizes, and makes mandatory rather than discretionary, the Hunter Kelly Research Program at the National Institutes of Health as well as national surveillance activities conducted by the Centers for Disease Control and Prevention.
Title
Newborn Screening Saves Lives Reauthorization Act of 2019
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-25 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
2019-07-24 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-07-24 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7365-7367) |
2019-07-24 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2507. |
2019-07-24 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7365-7368) |
2019-07-24 | House | Mr. Pallone moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2019-07-23 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 134. |
2019-07-23 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 116-174. |
2019-07-17 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2019-07-17 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-07-11 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote . |
2019-07-11 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-06-25 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-05-15 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H3796) |
2019-05-03 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-05-02 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2019-05-02 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Child health
Congressional oversight
Drug safety, medical device, and laboratory regulation
Genetics
Government studies and investigations
Health
Health information and medical records
Health promotion and preventive care
Health technology, devices, supplies
Medical ethics
Medical research
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
State and local government operations
Congressional oversight
Drug safety, medical device, and laboratory regulation
Genetics
Government studies and investigations
Health
Health information and medical records
Health promotion and preventive care
Health technology, devices, supplies
Medical ethics
Medical research
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
State and local government operations