US HB2119 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on April 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-07-17 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-07-17 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Reauthorizes for FY2021-FY2025 the program of Department of Energy grants to states to assist their units of local government in improving energy efficiency in public buildings and facilities.
Title
To amend the Energy Policy Act of 2005 to reauthorize grants for improving the energy efficiency of public buildings, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Robin Kelly [D-IL] | Rep. Jeff Van Drew [R-NJ] | Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-17 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2019-07-17 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-05-16 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote . |
2019-05-16 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-04-10 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-04-09 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy. |
2019-04-08 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2019-04-08 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2741 (Related) 2019-06-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States.
Subjects
Building construction
Energy
Energy efficiency and conservation
Government buildings, facilities, and property
State and local government operations
Energy
Energy efficiency and conservation
Government buildings, facilities, and property
State and local government operations
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/2119/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr2119/BILLS-116hr2119ih.pdf |