US HB1984 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-6)
Status: Engrossed on July 25 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-07-25 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

DISASTER Act Disclosing Aid Spent to Ensure Relief Act This bill requires the Office of Management and Budget to submit an annual report to Congress on all disaster-related assistance provided by the federal government. The report must include all federal obligations related to disaster response, recovery, mitigation efforts, and administrative costs associated with these activities for specified agencies and programs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DISASTER Act Disclosing Aid Spent to Ensure Relief Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-25SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
2019-07-24HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2019-07-24HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7287-7288)
2019-07-24HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1984.
2019-07-24HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7287-7289)
2019-07-24HouseMr. DeFazio moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
2019-07-11HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 110.
2019-07-11HouseReported by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 116-148.
2019-05-08HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
2019-05-08HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-05-08HouseSubcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management Discharged.
2019-03-29HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
2019-03-28HouseReferred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
2019-03-28HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback