US HB1882 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 88-0)
Status: Introduced on March 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expands specified programs to include access to menstrual hygiene products. Specifically, the bill requires that such products are made available to (1) public school students, (2) incarcerated or detained individuals, (2) homeless individuals, (3) individuals using health care flexible-spending accounts, (4) Medicaid recipients; (5) employees of organizations with at least 100 workers, and (6) individuals accessing federal buildings.
Title
Menstrual Equity For All Act of 2019
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security. |
2019-04-10 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E448) |
2019-03-27 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-03-27 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management. |
2019-03-26 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-03-26 | House | Referred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Financial Services, Ways and Means, Energy and Commerce, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-03-26 | House | Referred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Financial Services, Ways and Means, Energy and Commerce, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-03-26 | House | Referred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Financial Services, Ways and Means, Energy and Commerce, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-03-26 | House | Referred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Financial Services, Ways and Means, Energy and Commerce, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-03-26 | House | Referred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Financial Services, Ways and Means, Energy and Commerce, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-03-26 | House | Referred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Financial Services, Ways and Means, Energy and Commerce, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-03-26 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E355) |
2019-03-26 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2403 (Related) 2019-05-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Child health
Correctional facilities and imprisonment
Department of Justice
Department of Labor
Detention of persons
Education programs funding
Elementary and secondary education
Employee benefits and pensions
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health programs administration and funding
Health technology, devices, supplies
Homelessness and emergency shelter
Income tax exclusion
Law enforcement administration and funding
Medicaid
State and local finance
Women's health
Worker safety and health
Child health
Correctional facilities and imprisonment
Department of Justice
Department of Labor
Detention of persons
Education programs funding
Elementary and secondary education
Employee benefits and pensions
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health programs administration and funding
Health technology, devices, supplies
Homelessness and emergency shelter
Income tax exclusion
Law enforcement administration and funding
Medicaid
State and local finance
Women's health
Worker safety and health
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/1882/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr1882/BILLS-116hr1882ih.pdf |