US HB1157 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-02 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 406.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

To clarify the United States interest in certain submerged lands in the area of the Monomoy National Wildlife Refuge, and for other purposes. This bill states that Congress finds that the United States did not acquire any right, title, or interest in or to submerged lands in Nantucket Sound (near the coast of Massachusetts) or the waters above those submerged lands as a result of the taking described in the civil action, United States v. 3,000 Acres of Land (D. Mass. 1944). That taking involved land that is now part of the Monomoy National Wildlife Refuge.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To clarify the United States interest in certain submerged lands in the area of the Monomoy National Wildlife Refuge, and for other purposes.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-02HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 406.
2018-02-02HouseReported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-541.
2017-12-13HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
2017-12-13HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2017-12-12HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2017-12-12HouseSubcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged.
2017-04-05HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
2017-03-02HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
2017-02-16HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
2017-02-16HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback