US HB1133 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 86-1)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals provisions excluding any matter or question concerning professional conduct or competence; peer review; or the establishment, determination, or adjustment of employee compensation from the applicability of collective bargaining rights for Veterans Health Administration employees.
Title
VA Employee Fairness Act of 2019
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-03-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Oversight and Investigations. |
2019-02-08 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2019-02-08 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB462 (Related) 2019-02-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Armed forces and national security
Department of Veterans Affairs
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Health personnel
Labor-management relations
Veterans' medical care
Armed forces and national security
Department of Veterans Affairs
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Health personnel
Labor-management relations
Veterans' medical care
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/1133/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr1133/BILLS-116hr1133ih.pdf |