US HB1004 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 77-2)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting Unauthorized Military Action in Venezuela Act This bill prohibits funds made available to federal departments or agencies from being used to introduce the Armed Forces of the United States into hostilities with Venezuela, except pursuant to (1) a declaration of war, (2) a specific statutory authorization that meets the requirements of the War Powers Resolution and is enacted after the enactment of this bill, or (3) a national emergency created by attack upon the United States or the Armed Forces.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibiting Unauthorized Military Action in Venezuela Act

Sponsors

Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI]Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR]Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY]Rep. Diana DeGette [D-CO]
Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY]Rep. Tulsi Gabbard [D-HI]Rep. Walter Jones [R-NC]Rep. Debra Haaland [D-NM]
Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA]Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA]Rep. Andy Levin [D-MI]Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA]
Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA]Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN]Rep. James McGovern [D-MA]Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI]
Rep. Seth Moulton [D-MA]Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC]Rep. Alexandria Ocasio-Cortez [D-NY]Rep. Ilhan Omar [D-MN]
Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI]Rep. Jose Serrano [D-NY]Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD]Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY]
Rep. Peter Welch [D-VT]Rep. Karen Bass [D-CA]Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR]Rep. Don Beyer [D-VA]
Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME]Rep. Jesus Garcia [D-IL]Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA]Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL]
Rep. John Yarmuth [D-KY]Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV]Rep. Ayanna Pressley [D-MA]Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY]
Rep. John Lewis [D-GA]Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA]Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ]Rep. Thomas Massie [R-KY]
Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D-CA]Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA]Rep. William Keating [D-MA]Rep. Dean Phillips [D-MN]
Rep. Jim Costa [D-CA]Rep. Susan Wild [D-PA]Rep. Vicente Gonzalez [D-TX]Rep. Pramila Jayapal [D-WA]
Rep. Maxine Waters [D-CA]Rep. Katie Porter [D-CA]Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA]Rep. Ami Bera [D-CA]
Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ]Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY]Rep. Kathleen Rice [D-NY]Rep. Lori Trahan [D-MA]
Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA]Rep. Rashida Tlaib [D-MI]Rep. Dwight Evans [D-PA]Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR]
Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO]Rep. Adam Schiff [D-CA]Rep. Lloyd Doggett [D-TX]Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA]
Rep. Joaquin Castro [D-TX]Rep. Joyce Beatty [D-OH]Rep. Michael Doyle [D-PA]Rep. Daniel Kildee [D-MI]
Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA]Rep. Al Green [D-TX]Rep. Kurt Schrader [D-OR]Rep. Jackie Speier [D-CA]
Rep. Elijah Cummings [D-MD]Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA]Rep. David Price [D-NC]Rep. John Larson [D-CT]
Rep. Suzan DelBene [D-WA]Rep. Adam Smith [D-WA]Rep. TJ Cox [D-CA]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-09HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-04-09HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 25 - 17.
2019-03-13HouseCommittee Hearings Held.
2019-02-06HouseReferred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-02-06HouseReferred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-02-06HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SJR11 (Related) 2019-02-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback