TX SB641 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-02 - Referred to Public Health
Pending: House Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-02 - Referred to Public Health
Pending: House Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to dangerous wild animals; providing penalties; creating a criminal offense; authorizing a fee.
Title
Relating to dangerous wild animals; providing penalties; creating a criminal offense; authorizing a fee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-29 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-02 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2019-05-02 | House | Read first time |
2019-04-29 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Passed |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Water & Rural Affairs |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Filed |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB1268 (Same As) 2019-04-03 - Left pending in committee
Subjects
Animals
City Government
City Government--General
County Government
County Government--General
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
SHERIFFS
City Government
City Government--General
County Government
County Government--General
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
SHERIFFS