TX SB24 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 48-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-18 - Effective on 9/1/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 48-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-18 - Effective on 9/1/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the powers and duties of the Health and Human Services Commission and the transfer to the commission of certain powers and duties from the Department of Family and Protective Services.
Title
Relating to the powers and duties of the Health and Human Services Commission and the transfer to the commission of certain powers and duties from the Department of Family and Protective Services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-25 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-22 - House - Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal RV#1918 (Y: 124 N: 22 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-03-27 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-22 - House - Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal RV#1918 (Y: 124 N: 22 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-03-27 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-18 | Effective on 9/1/23 | |
2023-06-18 | Signed by the Governor | |
2023-05-29 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-05-29 | House | Signed in the House |
2023-05-28 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2023-05-27 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2023-05-25 | House | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Read |
2023-05-25 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2023-05-22 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2023-05-22 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-22 | House | Record vote RV#1918 |
2023-05-22 | House | Passed |
2023-05-22 | House | Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal |
2023-05-22 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-19 | House | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2023-05-19 | House | Amendment fails of adoption 3-Flores |
2023-05-19 | House | Amended 2-Holland |
2023-05-19 | House | Amended 1-Howard |
2023-05-19 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-05-19 | House | Placed on Major State Calendar |
2023-05-17 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-05-10 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-05-09 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-05-09 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-05-03 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-05-03 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-05-03 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-04-25 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-04-25 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-04-25 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-25 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-04-10 | House | Referred to Human Services |
2023-04-10 | House | Read first time |
2023-03-28 | House | Received from the Senate |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Statement(s) submitted |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Passed |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Amended |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Menéndez |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Vote taken in committee |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Filed |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB4049 (Same As) 2023-03-20 - Referred to Human Services
HB4049 (Same As) 2023-03-20 - Referred to Human Services
HB4049 (Same As) 2023-03-20 - Referred to Human Services
Subjects
Abortion
ADOPTION
CHILD ABUSE
Crimes
Crimes--Drugs
Electronic Information Systems
Family
FAMILY & PROTECTIVE SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
FAMILY PLANNING & BIRTH CONTROL
Family--Child Protection
Family--Child Support
Family--Parent & Child
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Human Services
Human Services--General
Mental Health & Substance Abuse
Military & Veterans
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
PREGNANCY & CHILDBIRTH
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control
ADOPTION
CHILD ABUSE
Crimes
Crimes--Drugs
Electronic Information Systems
Family
FAMILY & PROTECTIVE SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
FAMILY PLANNING & BIRTH CONTROL
Family--Child Protection
Family--Child Support
Family--Parent & Child
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Human Services
Human Services--General
Mental Health & Substance Abuse
Military & Veterans
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
PREGNANCY & CHILDBIRTH
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control