TX SB2316 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to controlled substance prescriptions under the Texas Controlled Substances Act; creating a criminal offense.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to controlled substance prescriptions under the Texas Controlled Substances Act; creating a criminal offense.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-29 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-14HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-05-14HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-05-13HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-05-10HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-05-10HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-05-10HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-05-08HouseMeeting cancelled
2019-05-08HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-05-07HousePosting rule suspended
2019-05-06HouseReferred to Public Health
2019-05-06HouseRead first time
2019-04-30HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-04-29SenateReported engrossed
2019-04-29SenateRecord vote
2019-04-29SenatePassed
2019-04-29SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-29SenateRecord vote
2019-04-29SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-04-29SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-29SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2019-04-29SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-29SenateAmended
2019-04-29SenateAmendment(s) offered FA2 Buckingham
2019-04-29SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-29SenateAmended
2019-04-29SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Schwertner
2019-04-29SenateRead 2nd time
2019-04-29SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-04-25SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-04-23SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-04-23SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-04-23SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-16SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-09SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-04-09SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-04-09SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-09SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-21SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2019-03-21SenateRead first time
2019-03-08SenateFiled
2019-03-08SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback