TX SB1196 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-09 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the declaration of a common nuisance involving a computer network or web address.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the declaration of a common nuisance involving a computer network or web address.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-22 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1537 (Y: 145 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-09 Effective on 9/1/17
2017-06-09 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-24 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-23HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-23SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-22SenateReported enrolled
2017-05-22SenateHouse passage reported
2017-05-22HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-22HouseRecord vote
2017-05-22HousePassed
2017-05-22HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-21HousePassed to 3rd reading
2017-05-21HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-21HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-18HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-05-17HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-17HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-17HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-16HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-05-16HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-05-15HouseReferred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
2017-05-15HouseRead first time
2017-04-20HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-04-19SenateReported engrossed
2017-04-19SenateRecord vote
2017-04-19SenatePassed
2017-04-19SenateRead 3rd time
2017-04-19SenateRecord vote
2017-04-19SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-04-19SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-04-19SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2017-04-19SenateLaid before the Senate
2017-04-19SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2017-04-10SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-04-10SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-04-10SenateReported favorably as substituted
2017-04-10SenateCo-author authorized
2017-04-04SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-04-04SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-04SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-09SenateReferred to Criminal Justice
2017-03-09SenateRead first time
2017-03-02SenateFiled
2017-03-02SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback