TX HCR30 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-29 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Urging Congress to direct the Bureau of Land Management to affirm the provisions of the Red River Boundary Compact and to acknowledge that the vegetation line on the south bank of the Red River forms the boundary between Oklahoma and Texas.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urging Congress to direct the Bureau of Land Management to affirm the provisions of the Red River Boundary Compact and to acknowledge that the vegetation line on the south bank of the Red River forms the boundary between Oklahoma and Texas.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-13 - House - Adopted RV#238 (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-29 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-24 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-23SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-22HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-21HouseReported enrolled
2017-05-20HouseSenate passage reported
2017-05-19SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-19SenateAdopted
2017-05-19SenateRead 2nd time
2017-05-19SenateLaid before the Senate
2017-05-19SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2017-05-19SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2017-05-18SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-05-16SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-16SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-05-16SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-05-15SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-15SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-01SenateReferred to Agriculture, Water, & Rural Affairs
2017-05-01SenateRead first time
2017-04-18SenateReceived from the House
2017-04-13HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-04-13HouseRecord vote
2017-04-13HouseAdopted
2017-04-13HouseLaid before the House
2017-04-13HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2017-04-10HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2017-04-06HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2017-04-06HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-04-05HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-04HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-04-04HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2017-04-04HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-03-30HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-03-30HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-03-30HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-30HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-02-15HouseReferred to State & Federal Power & Responsibility, Select
2016-11-14HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback