TX HB80 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 17 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - Signed in the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to a study and report regarding shortages in certain health professions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to a study and report regarding shortages in certain health professions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-16 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - Amended RV#444 (Y: 126 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - Laid out as postponed business RV#415 (Y: 76 N: 64 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-20SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-20HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-17HouseReported enrolled
2019-05-17HouseSenate passage reported
2019-05-16SenateRecord vote
2019-05-16SenatePassed
2019-05-16SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-16SenateRecord vote
2019-05-16SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-16SenateRecord vote
2019-05-16SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2019-05-16SenateRecord vote
2019-05-16SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-05-13SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-05-10SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-10SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-05-08SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-24SenateReferred to Higher Education
2019-04-24SenateRead first time
2019-04-23SenateReceived from the House
2019-04-17HouseReported engrossed
2019-04-17HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-17HouseRecord vote RV#444
2019-04-17HousePassed as amended
2019-04-17HouseAmended 1-Sanford
2019-04-17HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-16HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-16HouseRecord vote RV#415
2019-04-16HousePassed to engrossment
2019-04-16HouseLaid out as postponed business
2019-04-15HousePostponed 4/16/19 11:00 AM
2019-04-15HouseLaid out as postponed business
2019-04-15HousePostponed 4/15/19 4:45 PM
2019-04-15HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-15HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-04-11HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-03-13HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-03-12HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-03-12HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-03-11HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-03-06HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-03-06HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-03-06HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-02-27HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-02-27HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-02-27HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-02-27HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-02-27HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-12HouseReferred to Higher Education
2019-02-12HouseRead first time
2018-11-12HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB630 (Similar To) 2019-04-10 - Left pending in committee

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB80
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB00080I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB00080H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB00080E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB00080S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB00080F.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB80&RcdVtNo=415&Ch=H&Dt=04/16/2019
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB80&RcdVtNo=444&Ch=H&Dt=04/17/2019
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ05-16-F.PDF#page=6
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ05-16-F.PDF#page=18

Bill Comments

feedback