TN SJR0525 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-15 - Assigned to s/c Public Health Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-15 - Assigned to s/c Public Health Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Expresses support for U.S. Senator Lamar Alexander's efforts to renew the Teaching Health Center Graduate Medical Education Program and the National Health Service Corps.
Title
Expresses support for U.S. Senator Lamar Alexander's efforts to renew the Teaching Health Center Graduate Medical Education Program and the National Health Service Corps.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-29 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-15 | House | Assigned to s/c Public Health Subcommittee |
2020-01-14 | House | Ref. to Health Committee |
2019-04-30 | House | Ref. to Delayed Bills Comm. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 4/29/2019 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Recommended for adoption by Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/24/2019 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Rule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. FW&M Comm. 4/24/19 |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Filed for introduction |