TN SB0888 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Pub. Ch. 387
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, creates a 12-member task force to study issues relative to hemp commerce and consumer protection. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 4; Title 43; Title 44, Chapter 6; Title 47, Chapter 26; Title 53; Title 67 and Title 68.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, creates a 12-member task force to study issues relative to hemp commerce and consumer protection. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 4; Title 43; Title 44, Chapter 6; Title 47, Chapter 26; Title 53; Title 67 and Title 68.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-15 Pub. Ch. 387
2019-05-15 Effective date(s) 05/10/2019
2019-05-10SenateSigned by Governor.
2019-05-03SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2019-05-02HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2019-05-01SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2019-05-01SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2019-04-30HousePassed H., Ayes 90, Nays 2, PNV 0
2019-04-30HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0208)
2019-04-30HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2019-04-08HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2019-04-04SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2019-04-04SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 30, Nays 0
2019-04-04SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0179)
2019-04-02SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/4/2019
2019-03-27SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
2019-03-20SenatePlaced on Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee calendar for 3/27/2019
2019-03-20SenateAction deferred in Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee to 3/27/2019
2019-03-13SenatePlaced on Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee calendar for 3/20/2019
2019-02-11SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee
2019-02-07SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-02-06SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1468 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-15 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 387

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback