TN SB0782 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Effective date(s) 04/25/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Effective date(s) 04/25/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, increases the membership of the executive committee for the underground utility damage enforcement board from three to five members by adding two additional board members to the committee. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 5 and Title 65, Chapter 31.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4, Chapter 5 and Title 65, Chapter 31, relative to utilities.
Sponsors
Sen. Page Walley [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-10 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-05 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-05 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-03 | Effective date(s) 04/25/2023 | |
2023-05-03 | Pub. Ch. 224 | |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2023-04-12 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2023-04-10 | House | Passed H., Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2023-04-10 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0352) |
2023-04-10 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2023-04-10 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0400) |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/5/2023 |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/29/2023 |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/29/2023 |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/28/2023 |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/28/2023 |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/21/2023 |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0798 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 224