TN HJR0147 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Received from House, refer to Senate Health & Welfare Committee
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

"Rare Disease Day," February 28, 2019

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

"Rare Disease Day," February 28, 2019

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18SenateReceived from House, refer to Senate Health & Welfare Committee
2019-03-14HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2019-03-14HouseAdopted, Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 1
2019-03-07HouseH. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3-14-19
2019-03-06HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/7/2019
2019-02-28HouseAction def. in Calendar & Rules Committee to 3/7/2019
2019-02-27HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/28/2019
2019-02-19HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2019-02-13HousePlaced on cal. Naming, Designating, & Private Acts Committee for 2/19/2019
2019-02-07HouseIntro., ref. to Naming, Designating, & Private Acts Committee
2019-02-06HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback