TN HB2452 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-17 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-17 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, removes the declaration that it is the responsibility of each parent and legal guardian to ensure that their children are vaccinated according to Center for Disease Control or American Academy of Pediatrics guidelines, and replaces the declaration with a recommendation that children be vaccinated with vaccines recommended by the commissioner of health when advised by the parent or legal guardian's trusted healthcare provider. - Amends TCA Title 37.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 37, relative to immunization.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 74 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 1 BY HAWK PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 73 N: 22 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR LAY ON THE TABLE AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 23 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-04-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 73 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 1 BY HAWK PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 73 N: 22 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR LAY ON THE TABLE AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 23 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-04-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 73 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-04-15 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2024-04-15 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 73, Nays 25, PNV 0 |
2024-04-15 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0967) |
2024-04-10 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/15/2024 |
2024-04-10 | House | Reset on next avail. cal. |
2024-04-08 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/10/2024 |
2024-04-08 | House | Reset on next avail. cal. |
2024-04-04 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/8/2024 |
2024-04-03 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/4/2024 |
2024-03-27 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2024-03-20 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/27/2024 |
2024-03-19 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2024-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/19/2024 |
2024-02-06 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2024-02-01 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee |
2024-01-31 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-30 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2641 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-02 - Refer to Senate Health & Welfare Committee